# Shortcut for Multiplication of Numbers

How to do multiplication using vedic maths shortcut?

## Explanation

Multiplication of numbers with same first digit and sum of last digits equals 10 using vedic maths. This multiplication Vedic shortcut is applicable when,
Rule 1:
The first digit of both the numbers are same for 2 digit numbers,
First two digits of both the numbers are same for 3 digit numbers and so on. Rule 2: Sum of the last digit of the numbers equals 10. Follow the simple steps given below to learn the shortcut for multiplication trick.
Step 1: Take the first digit and add it with 1. Multiply the resultant value with the first digit.
For example., 56 x 54
(5 + 1) x 5 = 6 x 5 = 30 Step 2: Multiply the last digits of both the numbers.
6 x 4 = 24 Step 3: Write down the Step 1 result followed by the Step 2 result. The result is 56 x 54 = 3024 With further examples,
Example 1: 93 x 97
Step 1: (9 + 1) x 9 = 10 x 9 = 90
Step 2: 3 x 7 = 21
Step 3: Join the values, 93 x 97 = 9021.
Example 2:
66 x 64
Step 1: (6 + 1) x 6 = 7 x 6 = 42
Step 2: 6 x 4 = 24.
Step 3: Join the values, 66 x 64 = 4224.